IL HJR0067 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-26 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-26 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of Route 51 that runs through St. Johns as the "LCpl. Drew M. Uhles Memorial Highway".
Title
LCPL. UHLES MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-26 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-26 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000 |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-05-25 | House | Resolution Adopted 106-000-000 |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-04-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Friess |