IL HJR0060 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. House of Representatives to approve legislation to make the Buddy Check program for veterans a federal program.
Title
SUPPORTS-VETERANS BUDDY CHECK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2022-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-01-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000 |
2022-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2022-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-12-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=60&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HJR/10200HJ0060.htm |