IL HJR0060 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 22, 2019 through April 26, 2019 as "Illinois Science Education Week" to celebrate and acknowledge science education across the State of Illinois.
Title
SCIENCE EDUCATION WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=60&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0060.htm |