IL HJR0060 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-SEVENTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the House of Representatives adjourns on Wednesday, February 08, 2012, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, February 15, 2012, in perfunctory session, or until the call of the Speaker; and when it adjourns on that day it stands adjourned until Thursday, February 16, 2012, in perfunctory session, or until the call of the Speaker; and when it adjourns on that day it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 21, 2012, at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker; and when the Senate adjourns on Thursday, February 09, 2012, it stands adjourned until Friday, February 10, 2012, in perfunctory session, or until the call of the President; and when it adjourns on that day it stands adjourned until Wednesday, February 15, 2012, in perfunctory session, or until the call of the President; and when it adjourns on that day it stands adjourned until Wednesday, February 22, 2012, at 11:00 o'clock a.m., or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule ; 3-6(a) |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Mattie Hunter; 3-6(a) |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-02-08 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2012-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=60&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HJR/09700HJ0060.htm |