IL HJR0057 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-26 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-26 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Professional Review Panel and the Illinois State Board of Education to conduct the analysis and financial modeling required to evaluate the implications of implementing the recommended $22 minimum hourly rate for employees providing educational support services. The analyses should include the district impact of incremental increases beginning with $20 in school year 2025-2026, $21 in school year 2026-2027, and $22 in school year 2027-2028. The Professional Review Panel and the Illinois State Board of Education should include their findings in a written report to the General Assembly and Governor by December 31, 2024.
Title
MINIMUM ESP SALARY STUDY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-26 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-26 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-05-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-05-02 | House | Resolution Adopted 110-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-04-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |