IL HJR0055 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDREDTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the House of Representatives adjourns on Friday, April 28, 2017, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, May 09, 2017 at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker; and when the Senate adjourns on Thursday, April 27, 2017, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, May 02, 2017, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, May 03, 2017, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, May 04, 2017, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Friday, May 05, 2017, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, May 09, 2017, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.; 3-6(a) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=55&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0055.htm |