IL HJR0047 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of Illinois Route 2 in Rockton as the "Chief Arthur L. Weston Memorial Highway".
Title
CHIEF WESTON MEMORIAL HGWY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-03-05 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 015-000-000 |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=47&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HJR/10300HJ0047.htm |