IL HJR0040 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Centennial Bridge in Rock Island as the "Master Sgt. Stanley W. Talbot Memorial Bridge".
Title
SGT. S. TALBOT MEMORIAL BRIDGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Resolution Adopted 108-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-03-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=40&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0040.htm |