IL HJR0032 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes application to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for the calling of a convention of the states limited to proposing amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints on the federal government and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government.
Title
US CONST-ART V-APPLICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-02-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-01-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-10-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-06-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-06-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-06-26 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-03-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-03-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=32&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0032.htm |