IL HJR0032 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes application to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for the calling of a convention of the states limited to proposing amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints on the federal government and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE CON CON APPLICATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-000-000
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback