IL HJR0018 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-NINTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the House of Representatives adjourns on Wednesday, February 04, 2015, it stands adjourned until Friday, February 06, 2015, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Monday, February 9, 2015, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until February 18, 2015, or until the call of the Speaker and when the Senate adjourns on Thursday, February 5, 2015, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 17, 2015, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.; 3-6(a) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-02-04 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=18&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJR/09900HJ0018.htm |