IL HJR0013 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-08 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-08 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Retail Advisory Committee within the Department of the Lottery.
Title
RETAIL ADVISE COMMITTEE-LOTTO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | Tabled |
2013-03-08 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2013-03-07 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=13&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJR/09800HJ0013.htm |