IL HJR0005 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares August 17, 2021 as Orion Samuelson Day to honor his dedication to the Illinois agriculture industry.
Title
ORION SAMUELSON DAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Resolution Adopted 099-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Fourth Day |
2021-04-15 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Third Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Second Day |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Resolutions - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-03-22 | House | Recommends Be Adopted - Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-01-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |