IL HJR0005 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares February 28, 2017 as "University of Illinois Day" in the State Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNIV. OF ILLINOIS DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-05-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-09HouseResolution Adopted
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-02-09HouseRecommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 018-000-000
2017-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback