IL HJR0005 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
In honor of wounded and deceased veterans, designates Illinois Route 75, which runs from Freeport to the Wisconsin state line southeast of Beloit, Wisconsin, as the Purple Heart Trail.
Title
IL RTE 75-PURPLE HEART TRAIL
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Sacia [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Dennis Reboletti [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
Rep. Karen May [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens |
2011-03-08 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-03-01 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 015-000-000 |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia |