IL HB6303 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-10)
Status: Passed on August 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0885
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-10)
Status: Passed on August 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0885
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of firearms trafficking. Provides that a person commits the offense when he or she has not been issued a currently valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card and knowingly brings, or causes to be brought, into the State, a firearm or firearm ammunition, or both, for the purpose of sale, delivery, or transfer to any other person or with the intent to sell, deliver, or transfer the firearm or firearm ammunition to any other person. Provides that firearms trafficking is a Class 1 felony for which the person, if sentenced to a term of imprisonment, shall be sentenced to not less than 4 years and not more than 20 years. Provides that firearms trafficking by a person who has been previously convicted of firearms trafficking, gunrunning, or a felony offense for the unlawful sale, delivery, or transfer of a firearm or firearm ammunition in this State or another jurisdiction is a Class X felony. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a period of probation, a term of periodic imprisonment or conditional discharge shall not be imposed when the person has been found guilty of firearms trafficking involving both a firearm and firearm ammunition. Provides that the court shall sentence the offender to not less than the minimum term of imprisonment for the offense. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-FIREARMS TRAFFICKING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0885 |
2016-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2016 |
2016-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-05-30 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-05-30 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jim Durkin |
2016-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2016 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reported Back To Judiciary; 003-000-000 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
2016-05-04 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms (JU) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-3B | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |