IL HB6164 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriations for various agencies.
Title
$FY12 SUPPLEMENTAL VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andr |
2012-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2012-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2012-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2012-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly du Buclet |
2012-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2012-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2012-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2012-05-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2012-05-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2012-05-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2012-05-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6164&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/PDF/09700HB6164.pdf |