IL HB6157 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Municipal, Chicago Laborers, Chicago Park District, and Chicago Teachers Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. In every affected Article, except the Chicago Teachers Article, establishes a minimum contribution that must be paid to the affected Funds by employers during each fiscal year beginning in fiscal year 2013. In the Chicago Teachers Article, changes the required minimum contribution so that the Fund is 90% funded by 2046 (rather than 2060). In the Chicago Municipal and Chicago Laborers Articles, requires the amounts that must be paid for annuities, benefits, and administrative expenses to be paid by the city (rather than by the city from the prescribed tax levy). Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
PEN CD-EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2012-04-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 11-179.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 11-180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 12-155.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-129 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-174.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 8-191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6157&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB6157.htm |