IL HB6141 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-10)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-10)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations to the Department of Human Services for fiscal year beginning July 1, 2012, as follows: Home Services Program $399,380,000; Centers for Independent Living $4,475,600; Community Reintegration Program $3,400,000; Payable from the Home Service Medicaid Trust Fund $240,000,000; Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
$DHS-HOME SERVICES PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2012-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2012-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2012-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2012-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2012-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2012-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2012-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2012-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2012-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2012-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2012-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Cunningham |
2012-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2012-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2012-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles W. Krezwick |
2012-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2012-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2012-03-30 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andr |
2012-03-30 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly du Buclet |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott E. Penny |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan |
2012-03-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Andr |
2012-03-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andr |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2012-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6141&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/PDF/09700HB6141.pdf |