IL HB6037 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0877
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0877
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the following ground shall be accorded weight in favor of withholding or minimizing a sentence of imprisonment that at the time of the offense, the defendant was suffering from a serious mental illness which, though insufficient to establish the defense of insanity, substantially affected his or her ability to understand the nature of his or her acts or to conform his or her conduct to the requirements of the law. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-MITIGATION-MENTAL ILL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 94 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 94 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0877 |
2016-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2016 |
2016-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-021-000 |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2016-04-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2016-04-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2016-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-5-3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |