IL HB6009 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act, the Board of Higher Education Act, and the Public Community College Act. Provides for the Board of Higher Education's master plan for community colleges to be made in cooperation with the Illinois Community College Board (ICCB). Provides that community college performance metrics must be adopted by the ICCB by rule. Removes the need for approval from the Board of Higher Education or for ICCB approval with respect to certain community college provisions. Removes provisions requiring uniform financial accounting and reporting standards and principles for community colleges and requiring the ICCB to file copies of uniform financial statements from audit reports with the Board of Higher Education. Requires a community college district to report administrator and faculty salaries and benefits to the ICCB instead of the Board of Higher Education. Repeals Sections concerning a State university and college information system, an annual community college education study and report, the Academic Improvement Trust Fund for Community College Foundations, adverse court decision grants, State Community College District No. 601, and a mobile response workforce training pilot program. Effective July 1, 2016.
Title
BD HIGHER ED-ILL COM COL BD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0655 |
2016-07-28 | House | Effective Date July 28, 2016 |
2016-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2016 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-029-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 017-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 205 | 6.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
110 | 205 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 2-10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 2-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 2-16.05 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 2-18a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 2-19 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 2-23 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-22.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 5-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.528 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |