IL HB5934 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends Public Act 100-586. Repeals an appropriation from the Road Fund to the Department of Transportation for a grant to the Chicago Department of Transportation for infrastructure improvements. Adds the same amount to an appropriation from the Road Fund for construction and land acquisition. Effective immediately.
Title
$ROAD FUND-INFRASTRUCTURE
Sponsors
Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-08-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-08-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-08-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-07-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-07-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-07-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5934&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/PDF/10000HB5934.pdf |