IL HB5877 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Racial Impact Note Act. Provides that every bill which has or could have a disparate impact on racial and ethnic minorities, upon the request of any member, shall have prepared for it, before second reading in the house of introduction, a brief explanatory statement or note that shall include a reliable estimate of the anticipated impact on those racial and ethnic minorities likely to be impacted by the bill. Specifies the contents, and provides for the preparation, of each racial impact note. Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Prohibits racial discrimination and harassment by State officers and employees. Provides that each State officer and employee shall annually complete a racial bias, discrimination, and harassment training program approved by the appropriate jurisdictional authority. Expands the jurisdiction of the Executive Ethics Commission to include allegations of racial discrimination and harassment by persons registered under the Lobbyist Registration Act. Provides that the personnel policies of units of local government shall prohibit racial discrimination and harassment. Defines "racial discrimination and harassment". Provides for rulemaking, including emergency rulemaking. Amends the Secretary of State Act. Provides the Secretary of State's Inspector General with jurisdiction to investigate complaints of racial discrimination and harassment by persons registered under the Lobbyist Registration Act. Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Prohibits racial discrimination and harassment by persons registered under the Lobbyist Registration Act. Provides that each registered lobbyist shall annually complete a racial bias, discrimination, and harassment training program approved by the Secretary of State. Defines "racial discrimination and harassment". Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Requires the Department of Human Rights to establish a racial discrimination and harassment hotline for the anonymous reporting of racial discrimination and harassment in both public and private places of employment, and to provide for reporting by both telephone and Internet. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to provide for emergency rulemaking. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RACIAL DISCRIMINATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-11-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-11-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-11-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-11-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-11-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-11-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-11-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-11-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-06-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-06-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-06-07SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-06-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-06-07SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000
2018-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-001-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-22HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1530514Amended CodeCitation Text
2517010Amended CodeCitation Text
251704.8New CodeSee Bill Text
251705Amended CodeCitation Text
51005-45Amended CodeCitation Text
54305-10.10New CodeSee Bill Text
54305-5Amended CodeCitation Text
54305-70New CodeSee Bill Text
543050-5Amended CodeCitation Text
543070-5Amended CodeCitation Text
77552-108New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback