IL HB5842 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that the Authority shall, within 12 months of the effective date of this amendatory Act, create a website known as the Greater Chicago Mass Transit Transparency and Accountability Portal (CHI-TAP). Requires the website to contain a database of information concerning the number of employees employed by the Authority and its Service Boards, employing entity and division, and salary information. Provides the website must contain other information including contracts, expenditures, and safety and accident information required to be reported under federal law. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
Title
REGIONAL TRANSP INFO PORTAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mass Transit Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mass Transit Committee; 018-000-000 |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Mass Transit Committee |
2014-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2014-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3615 | 5.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |