IL HB5834 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for custodians of qualifying pupils for eligible education expenses related to online learning, including computers, printers, internet access, textbooks, tutors, and educational facilitators. Provides for an additional credit if the custodian is also an eligible teacher. Creates an income tax credit for employers of custodians of qualifying pupils for eligible expenditures paid by the employer on behalf of the custodian. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to provide for emergency rulemaking. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INCOME TAX-EDUCATION CREDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2020-09-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2020-09-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2020-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2020-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2020-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2020-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2020-09-10HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2020-09-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2020-09-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2020-09-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2020-09-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2020-09-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2020-09-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355232New CodeSee Bill Text
51005-45.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback