IL HB5820 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee Health Savings Account Law. In the definition of "health savings account program", removes a provision that prohibited the total annual contribution to such a program from exceeding an amount set by the Internal Revenue Service. Changes the amount an employer who makes a health savings account program available to its eligible employees must annually deposit in that account for those employees. Requires the health savings account program to be based on the creation of coverage options so that the average per person employer cost of the programs, including the contributions for the health savings accounts and high-deductible plan, does not exceed the average per person employer cost of the self-insured State employee health benefits program provided under the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971 for the same fiscal year. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH SAVINGS-CONTRIBUTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 377 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 377 | 10-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 377 | 10-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5820&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB5820.htm |