IL HB5782 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various appropriations from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services, the Department of Early Childhood, and the Illinois State Board of Education for early childhood and related purposes. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$DHS-ISBE-EARLY CHILDHOOD
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] | Rep. Lilian Jimenez [D] |
Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. Laura Faver Dias [D] | Rep. Mary Canty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2024-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5782&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB5782.pdf |