IL HB5771 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0875
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0875
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Corrects a cross reference in the provision concerning sentencing of persons who were under the age of 18 at the time of the commission of an offense. Provides that certain mandatory natural life sentencing provisions for criminal sexual assault, aggravated criminal sexual assault, and predatory criminal sexual assault of a child apply only to a person who has attained the age of 18 years at the time of the commission of the offense.
Title
CD CORR-SENTENCING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 71 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 71 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0875 |
2016-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-042-000 |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 009-000-000 |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |