IL HB5741 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0917
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0917
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency, in coordination with the Illinois Sustainable Technology Center, to make an assessment of available treatment technologies for reducing and removing compounds of emerging concern from wastewater treatment facilities, the statewide applicability of the treatment technologies, and the costs associated with the treatment technologies. Requires the Agency and Illinois Sustainable Technology Center to submit a report of findings from the assessment to the General Assembly by June 30, 2020. Defines "compounds of emerging concern".
Title
EPA-COMPOUNDS-EMERGING CONCERN
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Steven Andersson [R] |
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] |
Sen. John Curran [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0917 |
2018-08-17 | House | Effective Date August 17, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-20 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 018-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |