IL HB5710 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, upon request of an alternative higher learning institution, the school board of Rockford School District 205 may award a diploma to any person who has not received a high school diploma but has received a high school equivalency certificate from the alternative higher learning institution, with conditions. Provides for rulemaking.
Title
SCH CD-HIGH SCH DIPLOMA-ADULT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 022-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |