IL HB5690 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Sugar-Sweetened Beverages, Syrups, and Powder Tax Law. Imposes a tax on distributors of bottled sugar-sweetened beverages, syrups, or powders. Provides that the tax is imposed at the rate of $0.01 per ounce of bottled sugar-sweetened beverages sold or offered for sale to a retailer for sale in the State to a consumer. Provides that the distributor shall add the amount of the tax to the price of sugar-sweetened beverages sold to a retailer, and the retailer shall pass the amount of the tax through to the consumer. Requires those distributors to obtain permits. Contains provisions concerning the distribution of the proceeds. Effective January 1, 2015.
Title
SWEETENED BEVERAGE TAX
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-02-27 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2014-02-20 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |