IL HB5619 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-01 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-01 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that an alleged juvenile delinquent must be brought before a judicial officer within 24 hours to determine further custody, and that an initial hearing shall be no later than the following morning when the juvenile arrived in placement, including weekends and holidays. The 24 hour period will not begin until the juvenile is released from the hospital or treatment center, if the juvenile is hospitalized or receiving treatment. If false information is given by the juvenile as to age, the 24 hour period will begin once it is determined that the juvenile is subject to this Act. The 24 hour period shall be paused to allow the juvenile's legal counsel time to prepare upon a motion filed with the court.
Title
JUV CT-HEARING WITHIN 24 HR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Re-assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-05-25 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (CL) |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-039-000 |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-12 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee; 014-001-000 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-415 | Amended Code | Citation Text |