IL HB5613 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0874
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0874
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Law Enforcement Information Technology Task Force Act. Creates the Law Enforcement Information Technology Task Force to analyze, study, and make recommendations regarding the criminal discovery process, information sharing by law enforcement agencies, and other matters. Contains provisions concerning membership. Provides that the Task Force shall issue a final report to the Governor and General Assembly on or before January 10, 2017. Provides that the Act is repealed on January 11, 2017. Effective immediately.
Title
TASK FORCE-CRIMINAL DISCOVERY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0874 |
2016-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2016 |
2016-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2016 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2016-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-15 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |