IL HB5555 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1048
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1048
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act in the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Cross [R] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1048 | |
2010-07-14 | Effective Date July 14, 2010 | |
2010-07-14 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-001-000 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass Local Government; 005-000-000 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a) | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-027-000 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee | |
2010-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2010-03-18 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-18 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-12 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2010-03-12 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2010-03-11 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-11 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |