IL HB5545 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that "device" for purposes of possession of burglary tools includes a vehicle security circumvention device. Provides that a person commits the offense of unlawful sale of burglary tools when he or she knowingly sells or transfers a vehicle security circumvention device with knowledge that the device will be used by the person or another to commit a violation of law. Provides that a violation of this offense is a Class A misdemeanor. Defines "vehicle security circumvention device" as a device that is capable of obtaining, intercepting, or processing information from a motor vehicle keyless entry system with the knowledge that the use of the device will be used to gain entry into a motor vehicle without the owner's consent.
Title
CRIM CD-BURGLARY TOOLS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 19-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 19-2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 2-23 | New Code | See Bill Text |