IL HB5514 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that an individual or group policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed after the effective date of the amendatory Act must provide coverage for medically necessary hearing instruments and related services for all individuals (rather than all individuals under the age of 18) when a hearing care professional prescribes a hearing instrument to augment communication. Makes conforming changes, including repealing provisions concerning optional coverage or optional reimbursement for hearing instruments and related services. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
INS-HEARING AID COVERAGE
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] |
Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.30a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5514&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5514.htm |