IL HB5474 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and School Code. Requires the State Board of Elections to create a voter registration affidavit that shall be the exclusive means by which a noncitizen of the United States may register to vote in municipal and school board elections. Provides that the elections conducted under the provisions are considered non-State elections and not subject to the citizenship requirement in the Illinois Constitution. Provides what the individual shall attest to in the voter registration affidavit. Provides that the voter registration affidavit shall be valid for one municipal or school board election. Provides the notice that shall appear in the voter registration affidavit.
Title
MUNI/SCHOOL-NONCITIZEN VOTERS
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 9-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 9-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 1-1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 1-9-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 7-1-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5474&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5474.htm |