IL HB5471 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Certified Clinically Integrated Peer Support Specialist Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall create and periodically update a list of clinically integrated peer support specialist certifications that will be recognized by the Department. Provides that the Department shall recognize certifications that meet certain requirements. Provides that the Department shall create a registry for individuals to be recognized as clinically integrated peer support specialists. Provides that the Department shall deem individuals who satisfy certain criteria as clinically integrated peer support specialists. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services may use certain standards to support third-party reimbursement for services provided by clinically integrated peer support specialists. Contains provisions regarding formal or informal peer-to-peer support services and reimbursement for certain peer support specialist services.
Title
CLINICALLY-INTEGRATED SUPPORT
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5471&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5471.htm |