IL HB5451 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Emergency Solutions Grant Program Act. Provides that no landlord, mortgage company, rental property owner, or other vendor shall charge an administrative or processing fee on any application for housing submitted by an applicant for assistance provided under the Emergency Solutions Grant Program (formerly the Emergency Shelter Grant Program) established under the federal Homeless Emergency Assistance and Rapid Transition to Housing (HEARTH) Act. Provides that a violation of the Act constitutes an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Makes a conforming change in the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Effective immediately.
Title
EMERGENCY SOLUTIONS GRANTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2Z | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5451&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5451.htm |