IL HB5411 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1044
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1044
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical School Matriculant Criminal History Records Check Act. Provides that compliance with the criminal history record checks required by specified provisions may also be accomplished through the use of a criminal history record check entity approved by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Provides that each requesting medical school is solely responsible for payment of any fees associated with the use of a criminal history record check entity approved by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-MED SCHOOL-CRIM HIST
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R] | Rep. William Burns [D] | Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. Kevin McCarthy [D] |
Rep. Richard Myers [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1044 | |
2010-07-14 | Effective Date July 14, 2010 | |
2010-07-14 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass Higher Education; 008-000-000 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Higher Education | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-03-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Higher Education Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2010-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2010-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2010-02-23 | Re-assigned to Higher Education Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William D. Burns |