IL HB5407 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personnel Record Review Act. Provides that school districts may disclose an employee's personnel information to other school districts to which the employee has applied for employment, or for whom the employee has applied to be a volunteer if the employee is to have direct contact with students. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHOOL DISCIPLINARY REPORTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 40 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5407&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5407.htm |