IL HB5296 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-16 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-16 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Homeowners' Native Landscaping Act. Provides that an association shall not prohibit any resident or owner from planting or growing Illinois native species on the resident's or owner's lawn, with certain requirements. Provides for an Association to be able to adopt reasonable rules and regulations governing native landscapes, with certain requirements. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
DNR-MONARCH ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-017-000 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-001-000 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-037-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 006-003-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias |