IL HB5289 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that subject to approval by the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, both the fee-for service and managed care medical assistance programs shall reimburse qualified mental health professionals for hours spent supervising students and interns. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to establish a fee schedule for the covered services. Requires the Department to apply, by January 1, 2025, for any necessary federal waivers or approvals to implement the provisions of the amendatory Act. Requires the Department to submit to the Joint Committee on Administrative Rules a rulemaking proposal to implement the provisions of the amendatory Act as soon as practicable but no later than 6 months after the Department receives federal approval to reimburse qualified mental health professionals for hours spent supervising students and interns. Defines "qualified mental health professional". Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Provides that upon the receipt of all necessary federal waivers or approvals by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services as provided under the amendatory Act, the Department of Human Services shall reimburse qualified mental health professionals for hours spent supervising students and interns. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID REIMBURSEMENT-QMHP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-26 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024 |
2024-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee |
2024-04-04 | House | To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 1-41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-50.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |