IL HB5269 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. In a provision requiring the Holistic Mental Health Care for Youth in Care Task Force to submit quarterly reports to the Governor and General Assembly, removes a requirement that the report includes recommendations resulting from the Task Force's study regarding mental health and wellness services provided to youth in care. Changes the deadline date for the Task Force's final report to December 31, 2025 (rather than December 31, 2024). Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-YOUTH IN CARE-MENTAL HLTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Behavioral and Mental Health; 006-000-000 |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |