IL HB5249 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that subject to federal approval, within 12 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, nutrition care services and medical nutrition therapy provided by a registered dietitian licensed under the Dietitian Nutritionist Practice Act who is acting within the scope of his or her license shall be covered under the medical assistance program. Provides that the covered services may be aimed at prevention, delay, management, treatment, or rehabilitation of a disease or condition and include nutrition assessment, nutrition intervention, nutrition counseling, and nutrition monitoring and evaluation. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to apply for any federal waiver or Title XIX State Plan amendment, if required, to implement the amendatory Act. Permits the Department to adopt any rules, including standards and criteria, necessary to implement the amendatory Act.
Title
MEDICAID-NUTRITION THERAPY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-26 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-04-04 | House | To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aarón M. Ortíz |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernández |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norma Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5249&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5249.htm |