IL HB5232 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall compile and publish a disparity study by December 31, 2027 (rather than December 31, 2022) that: (1) evaluates demographic data (rather than whether there exists intentional discrimination) at the supplier or distribution level for retailers of beauty products, cosmetics, hair care supplies, and personal care products in the State of Illinois; and (2) includes recommendations for reducing or eliminating any barriers to entry for underrepresented populations (rather than to those) wishing to establish businesses at the retail level involving such products. Removes language requiring the study to evaluate the impact of the discrimination evaluated under paragraph (1) on the State. Extends the repeal of the provisions to January 1, 2029 (rather than January 1, 2024). Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-DISPARITY STUDY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-006-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 605-1080 | Amended Code | Citation Text |