IL HB5202 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the form prescribed by the Department of Revenue for estimated tax payments due on or after April 15, 2010 may not include the taxpayer's social security number. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-ESTIMATED TAX FORMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading | |
2010-02-02 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5202&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB5202.htm |