IL HB5164 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Requires the Department on Aging to establish and implement a Community Care Program Medicaid Initiative to: provide targeted funding to care coordination units to help seniors complete applications for medical assistance benefits under the State's Medical Assistance program; provide a funding pool to help care coordination units make improvements to the application process; establish requirements for State agencies to make enrollment in the Medical Assistance program easier for seniors; and other matters. Creates the Community Care Program Medicaid Enrollment Oversight Task Force to make recommendations on how best to increase the number of Illinois residents who are enrolled in the Community Care Program and receive services not paid for under the Medical Assistance program although they may be eligible for benefits. Provides for the membership of the Task Force. Requires the Task Force to provide oversight to the Initiative and to meet quarterly to provide the Department with data on the number of persons who receive Community Care Program services and are eligible for medical assistance but are not enrolled in the Medical Assistance program. Requires the Department to publish such data on its website and to collaborate with other agencies to determine how best to achieve the responsibilities of the Initiative. Establishes payment incentives to care coordination units that assist seniors in completing medical assistance applications. Provides that the Initiative shall cease operation 5 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act, after which the Task Force shall dissolve.
Title
AGING-MEDICAID INITIATIVE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Aging Committee; 011-002-001 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Aging Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Aging Committee; 012-001-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Aging Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Aging Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Aging Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |