IL HB5112 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a prosecution for criminal sexual assault, aggravated criminal sexual assault, or aggravated criminal sexual abuse may be commenced at any time (rather than within 10 years of the commission of the offense if the victim reported the offense to law enforcement authorities within 3 years after the commission of the offense). Makes conforming changes.
Title
CRIM PROSECUTIONS-SEX OFFENSES
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. William Davis [D] |
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-09 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5112&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5112.htm |