IL HB5109 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Designations Act. Designates portraits of Illinois Governors displayed in the State Capitol as the official State portraits of the Governors of Illinois. Prohibits inclusion among those official portraits any image of a Governor who has been removed from office by impeachment and conviction.
Title
STATE GUBERNATORIAL PORTRAITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1017 | |
2010-07-12 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-12 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000 | |
2010-04-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2010 | |
2010-04-15 | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 | |
2010-04-13 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Executive | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Bond | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-023-000 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended | |
2010-03-19 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-19 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-19 | Judicial Note Filed | |
2010-03-16 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended | |
2010-03-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended | |
2010-03-11 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 015-001-000 | |
2010-03-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-01-29 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading | |
2010-01-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black |